OK SB1496 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Public Safety, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Public Safety, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Violent crimes; modifying inclusions. Effective date.
Title
Violent crimes; modifying inclusions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Rep. Rhonda Baker [R] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Public Safety, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2020-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-03-03 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Baker (principal House author) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Floyd |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |