OK SB1488 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - 2 CCR failed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Wildlife Conservation Code; creating a landowner permit. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wildlife Conservation Code; creating a landowner permit. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03Senate2 CCR failed
2018-05-02Senate2 CCR read
2018-05-01HouseFurther conference granted, same conferees
2018-05-01SenateSCs changed Kidd, Boggs, Dossett, Bass, Jech, Pederson, Shaw to Murdock, Boggs, Fields, Bass, Dossett, Kidd, Jech
2018-05-01SenateCCR rejected, further conference requested
2018-04-30SenateRemove as author Senator Kidd; authored by Senator Murdock
2018-04-27SenateEnacting clause restored
2018-04-27SenateTitle restored
2018-04-27SenateCCR read
2018-04-24SenateSCs named Kidd, Boggs, Dossett, Bass, Jech, Pederson, Shaw
2018-04-24HouseConference granted, naming GCCA
2018-04-24SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2018-04-24SenateHAs read
2018-04-24HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-04-23HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-04-23HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 28
2018-04-23HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Kouplen
2018-04-23HouseGeneral Order
2018-04-10HouseEnacting clause stricken
2018-04-10HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Pittman
2018-04-10HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2018-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2018-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-14SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3
2018-03-13SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2018-03-13SenateCoauthored by Senator Rosino
2018-03-13Senatecoauthored by Pfeiffer
2018-03-13Senatecoauthored by West (Josh)
2018-03-12Senatecoauthored by Kannady
2018-03-12Senatecoauthored by Taylor
2018-03-08SenateCoauthored by Senator Leewright
2018-03-08SenateCoauthored by Senator Simpson
2018-03-08Senatecoauthored by Montgomery
2018-03-07Senatecoauthored by Osborn (Leslie)
2018-03-07SenateCoauthored by Senator Murdock
2018-03-07SenateCoauthored by Senator Sparks
2018-03-06SenateCoauthored by Senator Paxton
2018-03-06SenateCoauthored by Senator Bass
2018-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
2018-02-13SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-13SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Kidd
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
294114New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1488&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB1488%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB1488%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SB1488%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SB/SB1488%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB1488%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SB1488%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB1488%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB1488%20CCS.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB1488_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB1488_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback