OK SB147 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Referred for enrollment
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Commissioners of the Land Office; clarifying calculation of cap on investments in real property. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commissioners of the Land Office; clarifying calculation of cap on investments in real property. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14SenateReferred for enrollment
2021-04-14HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2021-04-14HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
2021-04-14HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Virgin
2021-04-14HouseGeneral Order
2021-04-01HouseCR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2021-03-03HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-03SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-02SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-02SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
2021-03-02SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-02-24SenateReported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
2021-02-02SenateCoauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Thompson
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb147&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB147%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB147%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB147%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/SB147%20HFLR.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB147%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/senate/SB147%20INT%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB147%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB147_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB147_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback