OK SB1464 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Quality Jobs Program Act; modifying definitions.
Title
Oklahoma Quality Jobs Program Act; modifying definitions.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Bingman [R] | Sen. Michael Mazzei [R] | Rep. Skye McNiel [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Rep. Purcy Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-22 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 45 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 68 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 68 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Approved by Governor 05/29/2012 | |
2012-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-24 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-24 | To Senate | |
2012-05-24 | Motion to reconsider tabled | |
2012-05-24 | Motion to reconsider tabled | |
2012-05-22 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Reynolds | |
2012-05-22 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 32 | |
2012-05-22 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Reynolds | |
2012-05-22 | Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 17 | |
2012-05-22 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker | |
2012-05-22 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-21 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-21 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-21 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2012-05-18 | Enacting clause restored | |
2012-05-18 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2012-05-07 | Conference granted, naming GCCA | |
2012-05-03 | SCs named GCCA | |
2012-05-02 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2012-04-24 | HAs read | |
2012-04-24 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-23 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 9 | |
2012-04-23 | General Order | |
2012-04-05 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2012-04-05 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman | |
2012-04-05 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-29 | First Reading | |
2012-02-29 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-02-28 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-28 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2012-02-28 | Title restored | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Mazzei | |
2012-02-28 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-02-16 | coauthored by McNiel (principal House author) | |
2012-02-16 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-16 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Bingman | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |