OK SB1447 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
School district boards of education; removing language requiring members to complete certain instruction. Effective date.
Title
School district boards of education; removing language requiring members to complete certain instruction. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 17 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Motion expired |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Jett |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 17 Nays: 28 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-03-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Williams (principal House author) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jett |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |