OK SB1446 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma House of Representatives; making an appropriation. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma House of Representatives; making an appropriation. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Second Reading, direct to Calendar | |
2010-03-10 | First Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-09 | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 15 | |
2010-03-09 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-09 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-02-04 | Direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-01 | coauthored by Miller, Martin (Scott) (principal House author) | |
2010-02-01 | coauthored by Myers | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Mike) | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
86 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |