OK SB1441 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Second Reading referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Second Reading referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency medical services; broadening exemption from certain regulation for ambulance service transports. Effective date.
Title
Emergency medical services; broadening exemption from certain regulation for ambulance service transports. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rosino [R] | Rep. Cynthia Roe [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2022-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roe (principal House author) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rosino |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |