OK SB1436 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers; providing for certification in comprehensive special education; providing for issuance of certain provisional certificate. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Teachers; providing for certification in comprehensive special education; providing for issuance of certain provisional certificate. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/21/2020 |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 1 |
2020-05-15 | House | General Order |
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Rosino; authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rosino |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |