OK SB1434 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-30 - Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Petroleum and gas excise tax; providing for transfer of certain revenue after specified date. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Petroleum and gas excise tax; providing for transfer of certain revenue after specified date. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 9 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 43) [FAIL]
2012-05-25 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 51) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 6 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 62) [FAIL]
2012-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-30 Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
2012-05-25 Sent to Governor
2012-05-25 Signed, returned to Senate
2012-05-25 Enrolled, to House
2012-05-25 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-25 To Senate
2012-05-25 Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 20
2012-05-25 Ayes: 41 Nays: 6
2012-05-25 CCR adopted
2012-05-23 CCR submitted
2012-05-23 Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2012-05-23 CCR adopted, GCCA
2012-05-22 Emergency removed
2012-05-22 Enacting clause restored
2012-05-22 Title restored
2012-05-22 CCR read, GCCA
2012-05-07 Conference granted, naming GCCA
2012-05-03 SCs named GCCA
2012-05-02 HAs rejected, conference requested
2012-04-25 HAs read
2012-04-25 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-04-24 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-24 Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 8
2012-04-24 General Order
2012-03-29 Enacting clause stricken
2012-03-29 CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
2012-03-19 Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2012-03-12 First Reading
2012-03-12 Engrossed to House
2012-03-08 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-08 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0
2012-03-08 General Order, Considered
2012-02-27 coauthored by Peters (principal House author)
2012-02-27 Title stricken
2012-02-27 Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Appropriations
2012-02-06 Authored by Senator Bingman
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback