OK SB1433 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Human trafficking; modifying required service of minimum percentage of sentence; definitions; penalties. Effective date.
Title
Human trafficking; modifying required service of minimum percentage of sentence; definitions; penalties. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Pam Peterson [R] | Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Rep. Justin Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/06/2014 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-30 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2014-04-21 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-17 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Wood |
2014-04-17 | House | General Order |
2014-04-02 | House | Title restored |
2014-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-26 | Senate | coauthored by Ivester |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Peterson (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newberry |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |