OK SB1426 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Center for the Advancement of Science and Technology; expanding goals; expanding purposes of certain institutions; modifying authorized investment for monies in the Seed-Capital Revolving Fund. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Center for the Advancement of Science and Technology; expanding goals; expanding purposes of certain institutions; modifying authorized investment for monies in the Seed-Capital Revolving Fund. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Coffee [R] | Sen. Mike Johnson [R] | Rep. Scott Martin [R] | Rep. Ken Miller [R] |
Sen. David Myers [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-27 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 73 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - House - House: CCR (Y: 66 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - House - House: CCR (Y: 66 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/10/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-27 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-27 | To Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 18; Ayes: 73 Nays: 15 | |
2010-05-27 | Ayes: 66 Nays: 17 | |
2010-05-27 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-27 | Laid over | |
2010-05-27 | Considered | |
2010-05-25 | CCR submitted, GCCA | |
2010-05-25 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 4 | |
2010-05-25 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-24 | Remove as author Senator Johnson (Mike); authored by Senator Coffee | |
2010-05-24 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-24 | Title restored | |
2010-05-24 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-19 | Pending removal author Senator Johnson (Mike) and replace with Senator Coffee | |
2010-04-28 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-28 | SCs named GCCA | |
2010-04-28 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-03-23 | HAs read | |
2010-03-23 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-22 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 13 | |
2010-03-22 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-22 | Amended | |
2010-03-22 | General Order | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading, direct to Calendar | |
2010-03-04 | First Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-03 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-03 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-03 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-02-04 | Direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-01 | coauthored by Miller, Martin (Scott) (principal House author) | |
2010-02-01 | coauthored by Myers | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Mike) | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 5060 | 1a | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5060 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5060 | 20a | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5060 | 20b | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5060 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5060 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5060 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
86 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |