OK SB1422 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Central Purchasing Act; modifying provisions relating to state agency purchasing. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Central Purchasing Act; modifying provisions relating to state agency purchasing. Effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18SenateCoauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
2020-02-13SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed
2020-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Thompson
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback