OK SB141 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
An act relating to school funding; modifying the weighted calculations for pupils enrolled in online courses. Effective date.
Title
An act relating to school funding; modifying the weighted calculations for pupils enrolled in online courses. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Coody [R] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 64 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Education: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Education: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Approved by Governor 05/03/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-27 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-27 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-04-26 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-26 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0; Ayes: 64 Nays: 28 | |
2011-04-26 | General Order | |
2011-04-07 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-03-15 | First Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-14 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-14 | Title restored | |
2011-03-14 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2011-03-07 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-07 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-16 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Education | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-02-14 | coauthored by Coody (principal House author) | |
2011-02-14 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |