OK SB1403 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle license and registration fees; limiting to fiscal years 2019 through 2024 the apportionment of fees to counties for roads that are subject to amounts apportioned in 2015. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Motor vehicle license and registration fees; limiting to fiscal years 2019 through 2024 the apportionment of fees to counties for roads that are subject to amounts apportioned in 2015. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Hall [R] | Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] | Rep. Nicole Miller [R] | Rep. Josh Cantrell [R] |
Rep. Clay Staires [R] | Sen. Chris Kidd [R] | Sen. George Burns [R] | Sen. Grant Green [R] |
Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | HAs read |
2024-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Staires |
2024-04-22 | House | General Order |
2024-04-04 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-04-04 | House | Title stricken |
2024-04-04 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Bullard, Burns |
2024-04-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Miller, Cantrell |
2024-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Title restored |
2024-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Kidd |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Green |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hall |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |