OK SB1380 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; transferring certain divisions and section from the Corporation Commission to the Department of Public Safety.
Title
Motor vehicles; transferring certain divisions and section from the Corporation Commission to the Department of Public Safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: S DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Vaughan (principal House author) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Allen |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 1120 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 162 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 166 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 169 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 170 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 170 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 171 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 171 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 172 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 177 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 177 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 32 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 34a | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |