OK SB138 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-30 - Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Motor vehicles; driver license flag emblem. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; driver license flag emblem. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 43) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: Veterans & Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-30 Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
2012-05-25 Sent to Governor
2012-05-25 Signed, returned to Senate
2012-05-25 Enrolled, to House
2012-05-25 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-25 To Senate
2012-05-25 Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0
2012-05-25 Ayes: 54 Nays: 1
2012-05-25 Coauthored by Representative(s) Hardin, Grau, Roberts (Sean), Dorman
2012-05-25 CCR adopted
2012-05-14 CCR submitted
2012-05-14 Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2012-05-14 coauthored by Sherrer, Inman, Bennett
2012-05-14 coauthored by Simpson
2012-05-14 CCR adopted
2012-05-08 CCR read
2012-02-29 SCs named Ballenger, Barrington, Simpson, Schulz, Russell, Garrison
2012-02-23 Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs
2012-02-16 HAs rejected, conference requested
2011-05-02 HAs read
2011-05-02 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2011-04-27 Referred for engrossment
2011-04-27 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0
2011-04-27 Coauthored by Representative(s) Vaughan, Scott, Roan, Ritze, Walker, Condit, Kirby
2011-04-27 General Order
2011-03-29 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
2011-03-16 Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
2011-03-09 First Reading
2011-03-09 Engrossed to House
2011-03-08 Referred for engrossment
2011-03-08 Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2011-03-08 coauthored by Stanislawski, Bass
2011-03-08 General Order, Considered
2011-02-28 coauthored by Shoemake (principal House author)
2011-02-28 coauthored by Garrison, Johnson (Constance)
2011-02-28 Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
2011-02-08 Second Reading referred to Public Safety
2011-02-07 Authored by Senator Ballenger
2011-02-07 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
476124Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback