OK SB1379 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Utilities
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Utilities
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Environment and natural resources; prohibiting DEQ from adopting certain rules relating to federal Clean Power Plan.
Title
Environment and natural resources; prohibiting DEQ from adopting certain rules relating to federal Clean Power Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Utilities |
2016-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 8 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-03-09 | Senate | coauthored by Brumbaugh (principal House author) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Treat; authored by Newberry |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Treat |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |