OK SB1342 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Vetoed 04/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Vetoed 04/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; adding exemption for continuing education for county treasurer acting as school district treasurer; authorizing training. Effective date.
Title
Schools; adding exemption for continuing education for county treasurer acting as school district treasurer; authorizing training. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-31 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Vetoed 04/09/2010 | |
2010-04-12 | Veto message read | |
2010-04-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-05 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-04-05 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-03-31 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-03-31 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-03-31 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 100 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-31 | General Order | |
2010-03-24 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2010-02-24 | First Reading | |
2010-02-24 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-02-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-23 | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10 | |
2010-02-23 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-10 | coauthored by Banz (principal House author) | |
2010-02-10 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-09 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Banz | |
2010-02-08 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Aldridge | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |