OK SB134 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Highway Patrol; retention of property after retirement. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Highway Patrol; retention of property after retirement. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/11/2015 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-05 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2015-04-16 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1 |
2015-04-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin |
2015-04-15 | House | General Order |
2015-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2015-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-02-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-02-17 | Senate | coauthored by Sanders (principal House author) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brooks |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 2 | 150 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 150 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |