OK SB1328 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Conference granted, naming GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Conference granted, naming GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Water quality and water quantity monitoring; stating funding needs. Emergency.
Title
Water quality and water quantity monitoring; stating funding needs. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Conference granted, naming GCCA | |
2012-05-03 | SCs named Crain, Branan, Marlatt, Schulz, Burrage, Paddack | |
2012-05-02 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2012-04-24 | HAs read | |
2012-04-24 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-23 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 12 | |
2012-04-23 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Fields | |
2012-04-23 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cannaday | |
2012-04-23 | General Order | |
2012-04-12 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-03-27 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-03-27 | Withdrawn from Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading | |
2012-03-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-07 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 | |
2012-03-07 | Title restored | |
2012-03-07 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2012-03-01 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2012-02-21 | coauthored by Richardson (principal House author) | |
2012-02-21 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-21 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Energy Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Crain | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |