OK SB1326 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Workers' compensation; clarifying applicability of act; clarifying exception to exclusive remedy. Effective date.
Title
Workers' compensation; clarifying applicability of act; clarifying exception to exclusive remedy. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 9 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |