OK SB1319 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; modifying various sections. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; modifying various sections. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. John Sparks [D] | Rep. Dan Kirby [R] | Sen. Bill Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Insurance Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Insurance Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/12/2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2014-04-16 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-15 | House | General Order |
2014-04-08 | House | Title restored |
2014-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2014-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2014-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 6 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Insurance committee; CR filed |
2014-02-06 | Senate | coauthored by Kirby (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Brown |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Brown; authored by Senator Sparks |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brown |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 1435 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 2691 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 311 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 348 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 4030 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |