OK SB1315 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-04 - Vetoed 06/04/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on June 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-04 - Vetoed 06/04/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Initiative and Referendum; relating to petitions filed with Secretary of State. Emergency.
Title
Initiative and Referendum; relating to petitions filed with Secretary of State. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Suspend Rule (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House: General Government Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Suspend Rule (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House: General Government Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-04 | Senate | Vetoed 06/04/2014 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-23 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-23 | House | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-23 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-22 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 33 Nays: 6 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 13 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Senate Rule suspended |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-05-22 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-19 | Senate | SCs named Marlatt, Treat, Schulz, Standridge, Sparks, McAffrey |
2014-05-16 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on General Government |
2014-05-15 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2014-04-01 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-01 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-31 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-31 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1 |
2014-03-31 | House | General Order |
2014-03-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2014-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 1 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Grau (principal House author) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Emergency added |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Bingman; authored by Senator Marlatt |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to General Government |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bingman |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |