OK SB1313 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Delivery of service; modifying persons authorized to accept or refuse certain service. Effective date.
Title
Delivery of service; modifying persons authorized to accept or refuse certain service. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Crain [R] | Rep. Randon Grau [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Approved by Governor 05/14/2012 | |
2012-05-08 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-08 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-07 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-07 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-07 | HAs adopted | |
2012-04-03 | HAs read | |
2012-04-03 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-02 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-02 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-02 | General Order | |
2012-03-28 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-03-07 | First Reading | |
2012-03-07 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-06 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-06 | Title restored | |
2012-03-06 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-02-21 | coauthored by Grau (principal House author) | |
2012-02-21 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-21 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Crain | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |