OK SB1297 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Court fines and costs; clarifying authority of courts to collect certain fines and costs through tax warrant intercept. Effective date.
Title
Court fines and costs; clarifying authority of courts to collect certain fines and costs through tax warrant intercept. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar |
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-03-03 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Weaver |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paxton |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |