OK SB1282 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; manufacturer exemptions; exempting for certain materials used in manufacturing. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; manufacturer exemptions; exempting for certain materials used in manufacturing. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-20SenateApproved by Governor 05/20/2016
2016-05-18SenateSent to Governor
2016-05-18HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2016-05-18SenateEnrolled, to House
2016-05-18SenateReferred for enrollment
2016-05-18SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2016-05-18Senatecoauthored by Sparks
2016-05-18SenateHAs adopted
2016-04-25SenateHAs read
2016-04-25HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2016-04-21HouseReferred for engrossment
2016-04-21HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0
2016-04-21HouseAmended
2016-04-21HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer
2016-04-21HouseGeneral Order
2016-04-07HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2016-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2016-03-10HouseFirst Reading
2016-03-10SenateEngrossed to House
2016-03-09SenateReferred for engrossment
2016-03-09SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
2016-03-09SenateTitle restored
2016-03-09SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2016-02-16SenateTitle stricken
2016-02-16SenateReported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2016-02-04Senatecoauthored by Echols (principal House author)
2016-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance
2016-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Jolley
2016-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1282&Session=1600
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB1282%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/SB1282%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/SB/SB1282%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB1282%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/SB1282%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB1282%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/SB/SB1282%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB1282_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB1282_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback