OK SB1280 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Reappropriating monies from Health Care Authority to Oklahoma State University Medical Authority Disbursing Fund. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reappropriating monies from Health Care Authority to Oklahoma State University Medical Authority Disbursing Fund. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-06 Approved by Governor 06/06/2012
2012-05-25 Sent to Governor
2012-05-25 Signed, returned to Senate
2012-05-25 Enrolled, to House
2012-05-25 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-25 To Senate
2012-05-25 Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 1; Ayes: 68 Nays: 3
2012-05-25 Coauthored by Representative(s) Williams
2012-05-25 CCR adopted
2012-05-24 CCR submitted
2012-05-24 Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2012-05-24 CCR adopted
2012-05-23 Enacting clause restored
2012-05-23 Title restored
2012-05-23 CCR read
2012-05-22 SCs named Schulz, Jolley, Bingman, Brinkley, Burrage, Ballenger
2012-05-22 Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference
2012-05-15 Conference granted, naming GCCA
2012-05-14 SCs named GCCA
2012-05-10 HAs rejected, conference requested
2012-04-25 HAs read
2012-04-25 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-04-24 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-24 Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
2012-04-24 Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker, Hoskin, Ritze, Cannaday, McDaniel (Jeannie), Hickman
2012-04-24 General Order
2012-04-11 Enacting clause stricken
2012-04-11 Coauthored by Representative(s) Dorman
2012-04-11 CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
2012-03-19 Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2012-03-12 First Reading
2012-03-12 Engrossed to House
2012-03-08 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-08 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 3
2012-03-08 General Order, Considered
2012-03-01 coauthored by Brinkley, David, Ford, Halligan, Stanislawski
2012-03-01 Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2012-02-21 Referred to Appropriations
2012-02-21 coauthored by Steele (principal House author)
2012-02-21 Title stricken
2012-02-21 Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2012-02-06 Authored by Senator Schulz
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7069722Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7069723Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7069724Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7069725Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7069726Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7069727Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback