OK SB127 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB127
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources
Pending: House Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources
Pending: House Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Corporation Commission; providing that Commission rules are not more stringent than Environmental Protection Agency standards, rules or regulations. Effective date.
Title
Corporation Commission; providing that Commission rules are not more stringent than Environmental Protection Agency standards, rules or regulations. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Rep. Jim Olsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2021-03-03 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2021-03-02 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Olsen (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Allen |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB127 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources