OK SB1253 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
State Auditor and Inspector; requiring deposit of certain funds in State Auditor and Inspector Revolving Fund. Effective date.
Title
State Auditor and Inspector; requiring deposit of certain funds in State Auditor and Inspector Revolving Fund. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-25 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 62 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 62 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-25 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-25 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2012-05-18 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2012-05-08 | SCs named GCCA | |
2012-05-08 | Conference granted, naming GCCA | |
2012-05-07 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2012-04-30 | HAs read | |
2012-04-26 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-25 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 32; Ayes: 62 Nays: 28 | |
2012-04-25 | Amended | |
2012-04-25 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze | |
2012-04-25 | General Order | |
2012-04-12 | Title restored | |
2012-04-12 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-03-15 | First Reading | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-14 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Faught (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-16 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation sub-committee | |
2012-02-07 | Referred to Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Ivester | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 213 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 227 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |