OK SB1216 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Coauthored by Representative Osburn (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Coauthored by Representative Osburn (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Motor license agents; requiring creation of digital safety deposit box program; requiring Oklahoma Tax Commission to adopt rules. Effective date.
Title
Motor license agents; requiring creation of digital safety deposit box program; requiring Oklahoma Tax Commission to adopt rules. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osburn (principal House author) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |