OK SB1210 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
School attendance; directing an absent student to be considered in attendance if engaged in certain activities. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
School attendance; directing an absent student to be considered in attendance if engaged in certain activities. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Rep. Lundy Kiger [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kiger (principal House author) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Allen |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |