OK SB1206 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/12/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Tourism improvement districts; adding class of improvement districts. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tourism improvement districts; adding class of improvement districts. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House: Tourism and International Relations Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-12SenateApproved by Governor 04/12/2016
2016-04-07SenateSent to Governor
2016-04-07HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2016-04-07SenateEnrolled, to House
2016-04-06SenateReferred for enrollment
2016-04-06HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2016-04-06HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 37
2016-04-06HouseAmendment restores bill to engrossed version
2016-04-06HouseEnacting clause restored
2016-04-06HouseTitle restored
2016-04-06HouseAmended
2016-04-06HouseGeneral Order
2016-03-29HouseEnacting clause stricken
2016-03-29HouseTitle stricken
2016-03-29HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Tourism and International Relations Committee
2016-03-14HouseSecond Reading referred to Tourism and International Relations
2016-03-08HouseFirst Reading
2016-03-08SenateEngrossed to House
2016-03-07SenateReferred for engrossment
2016-03-07SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 13
2016-03-07SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2016-02-24Senatecoauthored by Banz (principal House author)
2016-02-23SenateReported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed
2016-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife
2016-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Fields
2016-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1139103New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback