OK SB1198 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Coauthored by Representative Conley (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; requiring boards of education to coordinate with emergency medical services provider on certain plan. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; requiring boards of education to coordinate with emergency medical services provider on certain plan. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17SenateCoauthored by Representative Conley (principal House author)
2020-02-11SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2020-02-04SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Standridge
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback