OK SB1197 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; modifying student performance level labels and descriptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; modifying student performance level labels and descriptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateApproved by Governor 05/03/2018
2018-04-27SenateSent to Governor
2018-04-27HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2018-04-27SenateEnrolled, to House
2018-04-26SenateReferred for enrollment
2018-04-26HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 32; Ayes: 51 Nays: 32
2018-04-26HouseGeneral Order
2018-03-26HouseCR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
2018-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2018-03-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-08SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-07SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-07SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 10
2018-03-07SenateEmergency clause restored
2018-03-07SenateTitle restored
2018-03-07SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2018-02-20SenateCoauthored by Representative Nollan (principal House author)
2018-02-19SenateEmergency clause stricken
2018-02-19SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-19SenateReported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Stanislawski
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
701210541New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback