OK SB1192 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Airspace rights; modifying Airspace Severance Restriction Act. Emergency.
Title
Airspace rights; modifying Airspace Severance Restriction Act. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Ivester [D] | Rep. Fred Jordan [R] | Sen. Mike Schulz [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - House - House: Conference Committee on Natural Resources: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - House - House: Conference Committee on Natural Resources: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-16 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-16 | coauthored by Ivester | |
2012-05-16 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-10 | CCR read | |
2012-05-07 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Natural Resources | |
2012-05-03 | SCs named Schulz, Branan, Marlatt, Crain, Ivester, Burrage | |
2012-05-01 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2012-04-11 | HAs read | |
2012-04-11 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-10 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-10 | General Order | |
2012-04-04 | Title restored | |
2012-04-04 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Utility Regulation Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Utility Regulation | |
2012-03-15 | First Reading | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-14 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-27 | coauthored by Jordan (principal House author) | |
2012-02-27 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-27 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Energy | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Schulz | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |