OK SB1187 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Environment and natural resources; requiring Environmental Quality Board to promulgate rules governing water reuse projects; DEQ to issue permit. Emergency.
Title
Environment and natural resources; requiring Environmental Quality Board to promulgate rules governing water reuse projects; DEQ to issue permit. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House: Utility and Environmental Regulation Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House: Utility and Environmental Regulation Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/28/2014 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-21 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 11 |
2014-05-21 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Sparks |
2014-05-21 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-21 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 34 Nays: 6 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-05-20 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-13 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Utility and Environmental Regulation |
2014-05-05 | Senate | SCs named Standridge, Branan, Marlatt, Boggs, Sparks, Ivester |
2014-04-29 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2014-04-10 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 2 |
2014-04-09 | House | General Order |
2014-04-01 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-04-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Utility and Environmental Regulation Committee |
2014-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Utility and Environmental Regulation |
2014-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-20 | Senate | coauthored by Fields |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed |
2014-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Martin (Scott) (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |