OK SB1182 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Child abuse investigations; permitting Department of Human Services to contract with retired peace officers. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child abuse investigations; permitting Department of Human Services to contract with retired peace officers. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Human Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-28SenateApproved by Governor 05/28/2014
2014-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2014-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2014-05-22SenateEnrolled, to House
2014-05-21SenateReferred for enrollment
2014-05-21HouseTo Senate
2014-05-21HouseMeasure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3
2014-05-21HouseCCR adopted
2014-05-21HouseLaid over
2014-05-21HouseCCR considered
2014-05-20HouseCCR submitted
2014-05-20SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2014-05-20SenateCCR adopted, GCCA
2014-05-16SenateTitle restored
2014-05-16SenateCCR read, GCCA
2014-05-05SenateSCs named GCCA
2014-05-05HouseConference granted, naming GCCA
2014-04-29SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2014-04-15SenateHAs read
2014-04-15HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2014-04-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2014-04-14HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 3
2014-04-14HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Pittman
2014-04-14HouseGeneral Order
2014-04-03HouseEnacting clause stricken
2014-04-03HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
2014-03-18HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2014-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2014-03-12SenateEngrossed to House
2014-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2014-03-11SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2014-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2014-02-12SenateTitle stricken
2014-02-12SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2014-02-05SenateRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee
2014-02-05Senatecoauthored by Nelson (principal House author)
2014-02-04SenateReferred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services
2014-02-04SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2014-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator David
2014-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10A12New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback