OK SB1175 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Second Reading referred to Common Education
Pending: House Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Second Reading referred to Common Education
Pending: House Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
School personnel; directing boards of education that adopt certain policy to submit policy to the State Department of Education. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
School personnel; directing boards of education that adopt certain policy to submit policy to the State Department of Education. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Rader [R] | Rep. Daniel Pae [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2022-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 14 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pae (principal House author) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rader |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |