OK SB1172 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Supervised loans; authorizing certain fee for database access. Effective date.
Title
Supervised loans; authorizing certain fee for database access. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | CCR read |
2018-04-27 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Rules |
2018-04-27 | Senate | SCs named Treat, Leewright, Daniels, Kidd, Floyd, Brooks, Dahm |
2018-04-26 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2018-04-19 | Senate | HAs read |
2018-04-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 40 |
2018-04-18 | House | General Order |
2018-03-28 | House | Title restored |
2018-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Treat |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |