OK SB116 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB116
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State purchase card; authorizing use for the Oklahoma Film and Music Division of the Oklahoma Tourism and Recreation Department. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
State purchase card; authorizing use for the Oklahoma Film and Music Division of the Oklahoma Tourism and Recreation Department. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - House: Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/10/2019 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-04 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill |
2019-04-04 | House | General Order |
2019-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Tourism |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Mize (principal House author) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB116 (Carry Over) 2019-04-10 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2019