OK SB1159 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Weapons; modifying inclusions. Effective date.
Title
Weapons; modifying inclusions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. John Jordan [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. Ken Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/26/2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 5 |
2016-04-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker |
2016-04-19 | House | General Order |
2016-03-31 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze |
2016-03-31 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2016-03-02 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2016-02-08 | Senate | coauthored by Jordan (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |