OK SB115 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Uniform Military and Overseas Voters Act; repealer. Codification. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Military and Overseas Voters Act; repealer. Codification. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-19 - House - House: (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Government Modernization: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-25 Approved by Governor 05/25/2011
2011-05-20 Sent to Governor
2011-05-20 Signed, returned to Senate
2011-05-20 Enrolled, to House
2011-05-19 Referred for enrollment
2011-05-19 To Senate
2011-05-19 Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
2011-05-19 Coauthored by Representative(s) Banz, Dorman
2011-05-19 CCR adopted
2011-05-18 CCR submitted
2011-05-18 Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2011-05-18 coauthored by Sykes, Russell
2011-05-18 CCR adopted
2011-05-17 Title restored
2011-05-17 CCR read
2011-05-12 SCs named Ivester, Johnson (Rob), Sykes, Russell, Ballenger, Simpson
2011-05-11 Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Rules
2011-05-10 HAs rejected, conference requested
2011-04-26 HAs read
2011-04-26 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2011-04-25 Referred for engrossment
2011-04-25 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
2011-04-25 Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker, Tibbs, Ritze
2011-04-25 General Order
2011-04-07 Title stricken
2011-04-07 CR; Do Pass, as amended, Rules Committee
2011-03-16 Second Reading referred to Rules
2011-03-10 First Reading
2011-03-10 Engrossed to House
2011-03-09 Referred for engrossment
2011-03-09 Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2011-03-09 coauthored by Sparks, David, Bass, Garrison, Brinkley
2011-03-09 General Order, Considered
2011-02-22 coauthored by Trebilcock (principal House author)
2011-02-22 Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
2011-02-08 Second Reading referred to Rules
2011-02-07 Authored by Senator Ivester
2011-02-07 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2614116Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
2614117Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
2614118Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
2614119Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
2614120Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
2614136Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2614137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2614138Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2614139Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2614140Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2614141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2614142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2614143Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2614144Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2614145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2614146Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2614147Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2614148Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2614149Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2614150Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2614151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2614152Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2614153Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2614154Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2614155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2620101New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback