OK SB1144 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor fuel taxes; modifying distribution of motor fuel assessments. Effective Date.
Title
Motor fuel taxes; modifying distribution of motor fuel assessments. Effective Date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 58 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 58 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | HAs read | |
2012-04-30 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 17; Ayes: 58 Nays: 20 | |
2012-04-26 | General Order | |
2012-04-09 | Title restored | |
2012-04-09 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-03-13 | First Reading | |
2012-03-13 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-12 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-12 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-20 | coauthored by Liebmann (principal House author) | |
2012-02-20 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-20 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Bingman | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |