OK SB1140 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Government Efficiency, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Government Efficiency, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; providing exception from security risk assessments for certain state agency division. Effective date.
Title
Public finance; providing exception from security risk assessments for certain state agency division. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Government Efficiency, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency |
2020-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Townley (principal House author) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |