OK SB1127 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Teachers; creating the Teacher Retention Act of 2020; providing eligibility for certain annual bonus. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teachers; creating the Teacher Retention Act of 2020; providing eligibility for certain annual bonus. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
2020-03-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2020-03-04HouseFirst Reading
2020-03-04SenateEngrossed to House
2020-03-03SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-03-03SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10
2020-03-03SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2020-02-26SenateReported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
2020-02-18SenateReferred to Appropriations
2020-02-18SenateEmergency clause stricken
2020-02-18SenateTitle stricken
2020-02-18SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
2020-02-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Scott
2020-02-04SenateCoauthored by Representative Hasenbeck (principal House author)
2020-02-04SenateSecond Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2020-02-03SenateCoauthored by Senator Stanley
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Standridge
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback