OK SB1118 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Jett
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Jett
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; modifying training course exemption. Effective date.
Title
Firearms; modifying training course exemption. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Jett |
2022-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2022-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Gann (principal House author) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |