OK SB1114 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Public Safety, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Public Safety, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement training; modifying allowable programs. Effective date.
Title
Law enforcement training; modifying allowable programs. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Public Safety, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2020-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bullard |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |