OK SB1111 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Higher Education; directing the Regents to establish the University Center of Ponca City; providing oversight by board of trustees. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Higher Education; directing the Regents to establish the University Center of Ponca City; providing oversight by board of trustees. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 64 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 64 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Approved by Governor 05/15/2012 | |
2012-05-09 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-09 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-08 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-08 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-08 | HAs adopted | |
2012-04-30 | HAs read | |
2012-04-30 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 10 | |
2012-04-26 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 64 Nays: 14 | |
2012-04-25 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Ownbey | |
2012-04-25 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 38 | |
2012-04-25 | Amended | |
2012-04-25 | Remove Senator Fields as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Simpson | |
2012-04-25 | Remove Representative Denney as principal House author and substitute with Representative Ownbey | |
2012-04-25 | General Order | |
2012-03-28 | CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading | |
2012-03-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-07 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1 | |
2012-03-07 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-23 | coauthored by Denney (principal House author) | |
2012-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-13 | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Fields | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 57 | 303 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3213 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3216 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3980 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |