OK SB110 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Public buildings and public works; exempting state agencies from obtaining certain services for construction. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public buildings and public works; exempting state agencies from obtaining certain services for construction. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 18 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateMotion expired
2019-03-11SenateNotice served to reconsider vote on measure Bergstrom
2019-03-11SenateMeasure failed: Ayes: 18 Nays: 28
2019-03-11SenateTitle restored
2019-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-03-07SenateCoauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author)
2019-02-28SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-28SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Bergstrom
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback