OK SB11 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-27 - coauthored by Gann
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Self Defense Act; modifying application; procedures for licenses; Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Self Defense Act; modifying application; procedures for licenses; Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-27Senatecoauthored by Gann
2017-02-23Senatecoauthored by Faught
2017-02-23Senatecoauthored by Bennett (John)
2017-02-23Senatecoauthored by Coody
2017-02-08Senatecoauthored by Calvey (principal House author)
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Brecheen
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21129010Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
21129011Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
21129012New CodeSee Bill Text
21129014New CodeSee Bill Text
21129018New CodeSee Bill Text
21129019New CodeSee Bill Text
21129020Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
2112905New CodeSee Bill Text
2112909New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback